NY A08270 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - signed chap.539
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - signed chap.539
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Town of Kent to reopen the optional retirement plan offered under section 384-d of the retirement and social security law to police sergeant Jerry R. Raneri.
Title
Allows the Town of Kent to reopen the optional retirement plan offered under section 384-d of the retirement and social security law to police sergeant Jerry R. Raneri.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-23 | Senate | signed chap.539 |
2011-09-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-06-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-22 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2011-06-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1501 |
2011-06-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5668 |
2011-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | home rule request |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.449 |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.449 |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-06-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05668 (Same As) 2011-06-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8270