NY A08202 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing the temporary advisory board for upstate transit funding.
Title
Relates to establishing the temporary advisory board for upstate transit funding.
Sponsors
Asm. Anthony Brindisi [D] | Asm. Barbara Lifton [D] | Asm. Philip Palmesano [R] | Asm. Christopher Friend [R] |
Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. Clifford Crouch [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | tabled |
2016-11-28 | Senate | vetoed memo.240 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1880 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8045 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.167 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.167 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | print number 8202a |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S05794 (Same As) 2016-05-24 - referred to transportation
S08045 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8202A
S08045 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8202A