NY A08189 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to insurance reserve funds; establishes that such reserve funds shall not exceed twenty percent of prior year actual expenditures for health insurance.
Title
Relates to insurance reserve funds; establishes that such reserve funds shall not exceed twenty percent of prior year actual expenditures for health insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.1007 |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | referred to education |