NY A08189 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-15)
Status: Introduced on October 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-12 - print number 8189c
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-12 - print number 8189c
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a career and technical education (CTE) diploma; a CTE pathway to a diploma shall be based on a curriculum designed to provide students with technical skills and shall demonstrate that the student is ready for a career as determined by regulations of the commissioner.
Title
Establishes a career and technical education (CTE) diploma; a CTE pathway to a diploma shall be based on a curriculum designed to provide students with technical skills and shall demonstrate that the student is ready for a career as determined by regulations of the commissioner.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | Assembly | print number 8189c |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | print number 8189b |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | print number 8189a |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to education |
2013-10-04 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S05966 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - referred to education