NY A08172 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-05 - print number 8172a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-05 - print number 8172a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allowing certain members of the New York city fire department pension fund to receive a membership date in such fund attributable to service in the titles of police cadet program or police cadet program II in the New York city police department cadet program.
Title
Relates to allowing certain members of the New York city fire department pension fund to receive a membership date in such fund attributable to service in the titles of police cadet program or police cadet program II in the New York city police department cadet program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | Assembly | print number 8172a |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2021-07-07 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S08950 (Same As) 2022-05-02 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS