NY A08096 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-13 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-13 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to program procurements; clarifies the definition of services; allows the comptroller to excuse non-material deviations in procurement procedures and allows for pilot procurement methods.
Title
Relates to program procurements; clarifies the definition of services; allows the comptroller to excuse non-material deviations in procurement procedures and allows for pilot procurement methods.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-13 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2011-06-01 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S05817 (Same As) 2012-06-08 - PRINT NUMBER 5817B