NY A08079 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-17 - signed chap.492
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this legislation is to pen-nit community college regions to finance capital improvements through the facilities of the Dormitory Authority of the State of New York.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "community college region capital financing act of 2010".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-09-17 signed chap.492
2010-09-07 delivered to governor
2010-06-30 RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2010-06-30 PASSED SENATE
2010-06-30 3RD READING CAL.1378
2010-06-30 SUBSTITUTED FOR S4075A
2010-06-24 REFERRED TO RULES
2010-06-24 delivered to senate
2010-06-24 passed assembly
2010-06-24 ordered to third reading rules cal.331
2010-06-24 rules report cal.331
2010-06-24 reported
2010-06-24 reported referred to rules
2010-06-03 reported referred to ways and means
2010-05-20 print number 8079a
2010-05-20 amend (t) and recommit to higher education
2010-01-06 referred to higher education
2009-05-04 referred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S4075 (Same As) 2010-06-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8079A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback