NY S04075 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8079A
Status: Introduced on April 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8079A
Summary
Enacts the "community college region capital financing act of 2010".
Title
Enacts the "community college region capital financing act of 2010".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | SUBSTITUTED BY A8079A | |
2010-06-30 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1378 | |
2010-06-30 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2010-05-20 | PRINT NUMBER 4075A | |
2010-05-20 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS | |
2009-04-09 | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A8079 (Same As) 2010-09-17 - signed chap.492
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04075&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |