NY A08020 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.575
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.575
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to orders committing guardianship and custody of a child.
Title
Relates to orders committing guardianship and custody of a child.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.575 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.415 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.415 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05790 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES