NY A07958 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the assessor of the town of Islip to accept an application for exemption from real property taxes from the Gospel Tabernacle Church of God in Christ for a certain parcel of land located in the town of Islip.
Title
Authorizes the assessor of the town of Islip to accept an application for exemption from real property taxes from the Gospel Tabernacle Church of God in Christ for a certain parcel of land located in the town of Islip.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.413 |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.413 |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-06-12 | Assembly | print number 7958b |
2012-06-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2012-01-11 | Assembly | print number 7958a |
2012-01-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2011-05-25 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S04722 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES