NY A07910 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - substituted by s5719
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - substituted by s5719
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends, until December 31, 2017, the expiration of the authority granted to the county of Suffolk to impose hotel and motel taxes.
Title
Extends, until December 31, 2017, the expiration of the authority granted to the county of Suffolk to impose hotel and motel taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-25 | Assembly | substituted by s5719 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.426 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.426 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | print number 7910a |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2015-05-29 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05719 (Same As) 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.348