NY S05719 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends, until December 31, 2017, the expiration of the authority granted to the county of Suffolk to impose hotel and motel taxes.
Title
Extends, until December 31, 2017, the expiration of the authority granted to the county of Suffolk to impose hotel and motel taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 103 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.348 |
2015-09-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | home rule request |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.426 |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | substituted for a7910a |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1862 |
2015-05-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07910 (Same As) 2015-06-25 - substituted by s5719