NY A07859 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.234
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.234
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of the office for people with developmental disabilities to conduct a study in consultation with the comptroller's office on whether it is feasible to allow the use of debit cards for residents' cash accounts to be used for facilities and service providers holding operating certificates.
Title
Directs the commissioner of the office for people with developmental disabilities to conduct a study in consultation with the comptroller's office on whether it is feasible to allow the use of debit cards for residents' cash accounts to be used for facilities and service providers holding operating certificates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Mental Health Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Mental Health Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Mental Health Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Mental Health Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.234 |
2020-09-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.402 |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | substituted for a7859a |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2020-01-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | AMENDED 5538A |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.182 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Senate | died in assembly |
2019-05-29 | Senate | referred to mental health |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.824 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | substituted by s5538a |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.402 |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | reported |
2020-02-05 | Assembly | print number 7859a |
2020-02-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to mental health |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S05538 (Same As) 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.234