NY A07837 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - substituted by s6313c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - substituted by s6313c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Niagara to transfer ownership of certain parkland to the town of Lockport.
Title
Authorizes the county of Niagara to transfer ownership of certain parkland to the town of Lockport.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Assembly | substituted by s6313c |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.538 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-05-13 | Assembly | print number 7837c |
2022-05-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | print number 7837b |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2022-01-21 | Assembly | print number 7837a |
2022-01-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S06313 (Same As) 2022-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.441