NY S06313 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.441
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.441
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Niagara to transfer ownership of certain parkland to the town of Lockport.
Title
Authorizes the county of Niagara to transfer ownership of certain parkland to the town of Lockport.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-21 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.441 |
2022-07-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | home rule request |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | home rule request |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.538 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | substituted for a7837c |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-01 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2022-05-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1536 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6313C |
2022-05-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-05-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6313B |
2022-05-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-01-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6313A |
2022-01-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2021-04-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07837 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - substituted by s6313c