NY A07821 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-20 - committed to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-20 - committed to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending certain provisions of the labor law.
Title
Relates to extending certain provisions of the labor law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-20 | Assembly | committed to labor |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.317 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.306 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.306 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | referred to labor |