NY A07765 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - SIGNED CHAP.167
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - SIGNED CHAP.167
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the use of an electronic signature on tax documents collected by tax preparers.
Title
Relates to the use of an electronic signature on tax documents collected by tax preparers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-24 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.167 |
2020-08-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-23 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-07-23 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.308 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | substituted for a7765a |
2020-07-23 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1030 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted by s8832 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.308 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.308 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | print number 7765a |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05661 (Same As) 2020-07-21 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
S08832 (Same As) 2020-08-24 - SIGNED CHAP.167
S08832 (Same As) 2020-08-24 - SIGNED CHAP.167