NY S08832 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - SIGNED CHAP.167
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - SIGNED CHAP.167
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the use of an electronic signature on tax documents collected by tax preparers.
Title
Relates to the use of an electronic signature on tax documents collected by tax preparers.
Sponsors
Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-24 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.167 |
2020-08-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.308 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted for a7765a |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1030 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07765 (Same As) 2020-08-24 - SIGNED CHAP.167