NY A07761 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows employers to suspend a police officer without pay pending disciplinary charges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows employers to suspend a police officer without pay pending disciplinary charges.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-17Senatetabled
2012-08-17Senatevetoed memo.141
2012-08-06Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-21AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-21SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-21Senate3RD READING CAL.1461
2012-06-21SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5336A
2012-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2012-06-20Senatereturned to senate
2012-06-20Assemblyrepassed assembly
2012-06-13Assemblyamended on third reading 7761a
2012-06-13Assemblyvote reconsidered - restored to third reading
2012-06-13AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-13Senaterecalled from senate
2012-05-30SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2012-05-30Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-05-30Assemblypassed assembly
2012-05-24Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.639
2012-05-22Assemblyreported
2012-05-15Assemblyreported referred to codes
2012-01-18Assemblycommitted to governmental employees
2012-01-04Assemblyordered to third reading cal.259
2012-01-04SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-01-04SenateDIED IN SENATE
2011-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2011-06-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2011-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2011-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.488
2011-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.488
2011-06-20Assemblyreported
2011-06-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2011-06-07Assemblyreported referred to codes
2011-05-16Assemblyreferred to governmental employees

Same As/Similar To

S05336 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7761A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback