NY S05336 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7761A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7761A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows employers to suspend a police officer without pay pending disciplinary charges.
Title
Allows employers to suspend a police officer without pay pending disciplinary charges.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7761A |
2012-06-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1461 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-06-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5336A |
2012-06-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2011-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07761 (Same As) 2012-08-17 - tabled