NY A07721 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s7128
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s7128
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the composition and obligations of the child care availability taskforce and the focus of such taskforce.
Title
Relates to the composition and obligations of the child care availability taskforce and the focus of such taskforce.
Sponsors
Asm. Sarah Clark [D] | Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D] | Asm. Fred Thiele [D] | Asm. Maritza Davila [D] |
Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. Anna Kelles [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Assembly | substituted by s7128 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.507 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | print number 7721a |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S07128 (Same As) 2021-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.149