NY A07699 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-16 - substituted by s6666
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-16 - substituted by s6666
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies certain interest rates for life insurance within the standard nonforfeiture law.
Title
Modifies certain interest rates for life insurance within the standard nonforfeiture law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Assembly | substituted by s6666 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.197 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S06666 (Same As) 2022-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.443