NY A07610 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-26 - signed chap.329
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-26 - signed chap.329
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Restricts fees on gift cards and gift certificates issued by merchants for goods and services; permits a service fee to be assessed after the twenty-fourth month.
Title
Restricts fees on gift cards and gift certificates issued by merchants for goods and services; permits a service fee to be assessed after the twenty-fourth month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | Senate | signed chap.329 |
2016-09-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-08 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1489 |
2016-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4771E |
2016-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7610e |
2016-02-09 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 7610d |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.302 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-16 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-16 | Senate | returned to senate |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | restored to third reading |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | amended by restoring to previous print 7610b |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7610c |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-11 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2015-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.160 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.160 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 7610b |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 7610a |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S04771 (Same As) 2016-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7610E