NY S04771 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7610E
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7610E
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Restricts fees on gift cards and gift certificates issued by merchants for goods and services; permits a service fee to be assessed after the twenty-fourth month.
Title
Restricts fees on gift cards and gift certificates issued by merchants for goods and services; permits a service fee to be assessed after the twenty-fourth month.
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Funke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7610E |
2016-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1489 |
2016-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-05-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4771E |
2016-05-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2016-02-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4771D |
2016-02-11 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2015-06-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4771C |
2015-06-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2015-06-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4771B |
2015-06-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2015-06-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4771A |
2015-06-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2015-05-28 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2015-04-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A07610 (Same As) 2016-09-26 - signed chap.329