NY A07532 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - signed chap.119
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - signed chap.119
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to automated external defibrillators.
Title
Relates to automated external defibrillators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-25 | Senate | signed chap.119 |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-08 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.906 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5718 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.362 |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05718 (Same As) 2017-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7532