NY S05718 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7532
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7532
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to automated external defibrillators.
Title
Relates to automated external defibrillators.
Sponsors
Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7532 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.906 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07532 (Same As) 2017-07-25 - signed chap.119