NY A07432 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - substituted by s6091a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - substituted by s6091a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the town of West Seneca, county of Erie, as the "Trooper Joseph Gallagher Memorial Bridge".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the town of West Seneca, county of Erie, as the "Trooper Joseph Gallagher Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s6091a |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.377 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.377 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-14 | Assembly | print number 7432a |
2021-05-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2021-05-07 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06091 (Same As) 2021-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.313