NY S06091 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.313
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.313
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the town of West Seneca, county of Erie, as the "Trooper Joseph Gallagher Memorial Bridge".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the town of West Seneca, county of Erie, as the "Trooper Joseph Gallagher Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Philip Boyle [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] |
Sen. Mario Mattera [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-28 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.313 |
2021-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.377 |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a7432a |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-05-24 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-24 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2021-05-20 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6091A |
2021-05-20 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-05-20 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-05-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-04-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.713 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07432 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - substituted by s6091a