NY A07429 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "division of research and analysis" which is a part of the legislative library and assists members of the legislature by providing research and analysis on policy.
Title
Establishes the "division of research and analysis" which is a part of the legislative library and assists members of the legislature by providing research and analysis on policy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2019-10-25 | Assembly | print number 7429a |
2019-10-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2019-05-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S05159 (Same As) 2020-03-03 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE