NY S05159 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "division of research and analysis" which is a part of the legislative library and assists members of the legislature by providing research and analysis on policy.
Title
Establishes the "division of research and analysis" which is a part of the legislative library and assists members of the legislature by providing research and analysis on policy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2019-10-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5159A |
2019-10-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-04-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-04-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07429 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental operations