NY A07424 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-16 - substituted by s5684a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-16 - substituted by s5684a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to New York city omnibus safety requirements; defines terms; provides for the retrofitting of omnibuses with silent emergency alarms that are synchronized with existing bus GPS devices so that the location of such bus emitting the alarm is immediately known by the command center of the New York city transit authority.
Title
Relates to New York city omnibus safety requirements; defines terms; provides for the retrofitting of omnibuses with silent emergency alarms that are synchronized with existing bus GPS devices so that the location of such bus emitting the alarm is immediately known by the command center of the New York city transit authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Assembly | substituted by s5684a |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.262 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | print number 7424a |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to cities |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to cities |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S05684 (Same As) 2014-12-29 - VETOED MEMO.583