NY S05684 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - VETOED MEMO.583
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to New York city omnibus safety requirements; defines terms; provides for the retrofitting of omnibuses with silent emergency alarms that are synchronized with existing bus GPS devices so that the location of such bus emitting the alarm is immediately known by the command center of the New York city transit authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to New York city omnibus safety requirements; defines terms; provides for the retrofitting of omnibuses with silent emergency alarms that are synchronized with existing bus GPS devices so that the location of such bus emitting the alarm is immediately known by the command center of the New York city transit authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 123 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-29AssemblyVETOED MEMO.583
2014-12-17SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2014-06-16Assemblyreturned to senate
2014-06-16Assemblypassed assembly
2014-06-16Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.262
2014-06-16Assemblysubstituted for a7424a
2014-06-02Assemblyreferred to cities
2014-06-02SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-06-02SenatePASSED SENATE
2014-05-19SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2014-05-14Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2014-05-14SenateAMENDED 5684A
2014-05-13Senate1ST REPORT CAL.706
2014-01-08SenateREFERRED TO CITIES
2013-06-04SenateREFERRED TO CITIES

Same As/Similar To

A07424 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - substituted by s5684a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback