NY A07417 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.78
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.78
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the county law relating to communication service surcharges applied to Tompkins county, in relation to extending the provisions of such chapter.
Title
Amends the county law relating to communication service surcharges applied to Tompkins county, in relation to extending the provisions of such chapter.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.78 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.165 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | substituted for a7417 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | referred to local governments |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1148 |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 5193A |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-04-15 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s5193a |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.165 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.165 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S05193 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.78