NY A07402 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-11-15 - signed chap.457
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-11-15 - signed chap.457
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits dental assistants and licensed practical nurses to perform the application of topical fluoride varnish.
Title
Permits dental assistants and licensed practical nurses to perform the application of topical fluoride varnish.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-11-15 | Assembly | signed chap.457 |
2024-11-15 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2024-06-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-05 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1785 |
2024-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9308A |
2024-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.169 |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | rules report cal.169 |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | reported |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | print number 7402b |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to higher education |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | print number 7402a |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to higher education |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-19 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S09308 (Same As) 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7402B