NY A07356 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - substituted by s5011a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - substituted by s5011a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Continues authorization of lease between the Board of Education of the Hawthorne Cedar Knolls Union Free School District and the Geller House, in the County of Westchester.
Title
Continues authorization of lease between the Board of Education of the Hawthorne Cedar Knolls Union Free School District and the Geller House, in the County of Westchester.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | Assembly | substituted by s5011a |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.700 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.700 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-05-14 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S05011 (Same As) 2013-07-31 - SIGNED CHAP.277