NY A07285 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - signed chap.420
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to reporting requirements for resource sharing between the power authority of the state of New York, the department of transportation and the canal corporation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to reporting requirements for resource sharing between the power authority of the state of New York, the department of transportation and the canal corporation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-29Senatesigned chap.420
2017-11-17Assemblydelivered to governor
2017-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1907
2017-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6007
2017-05-08SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
2017-05-08Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-05-08Assemblypassed assembly
2017-04-27Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.251
2017-04-25Assemblyreported
2017-04-19Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S06007 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7285

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback