NY A07281 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-2)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - print number 7281a
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - print number 7281a
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits health insurers, health care plans and HMOs from requiring prior authorization for pre-exposure prophylaxis used to prevent HIV infection.
Title
Prohibits health insurers, health care plans and HMOs from requiring prior authorization for pre-exposure prophylaxis used to prevent HIV infection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Assembly | print number 7281a |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S06779 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES