NY S06779 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits health insurers, health care plans and HMOs from requiring prior authorization for pre-exposure prophylaxis used to prevent HIV infection.
Title
Prohibits health insurers, health care plans and HMOs from requiring prior authorization for pre-exposure prophylaxis used to prevent HIV infection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-02 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6779A |
2020-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.422 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-10-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07281 (Same As) 2020-03-02 - print number 7281a