NY A07273 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - signed chap.645
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - signed chap.645
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the New York city housing authority to provide written notice to residents of disruptions to water services when water is not safe for drinking or cooking; requires the New York city housing authority to establish measures to ensure all contractors and subcontractors who deal with the collection and examining of water samples to comply with federal, state and local laws, rules and regulations regarding the examination of water quality.
Title
Requires the New York city housing authority to provide written notice to residents of disruptions to water services when water is not safe for drinking or cooking; requires the New York city housing authority to establish measures to ensure all contractors and subcontractors who deal with the collection and examining of water samples to comply with federal, state and local laws, rules and regulations regarding the examination of water quality.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-17 | Assembly | signed chap.645 |
2023-11-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1853 |
2023-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7456 |
2023-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.660 |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.660 |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S07456 (Same As) 2023-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7273