NY A07251 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies provisions related to the overtime ceiling for correction officers of the Westchester county correction department for the purposes of retirement benefits.
Title
Clarifies provisions related to the overtime ceiling for correction officers of the Westchester county correction department for the purposes of retirement benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2024-02-21 | Assembly | print number 7251a |
2024-02-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06400 (Same As) 2024-03-18 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN