NY A07241 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits recordkeeping and reporting duties of public notaries to electronic notarization acts.
Title
Limits recordkeeping and reporting duties of public notaries to electronic notarization acts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2024-05-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-05-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.428 |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | reported |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | print number 7241a |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to judiciary |
2023-05-15 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S08663 (Same As) 2024-02-27 - REFERRED TO FINANCE