NY A07229 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-11 - signed chap.414
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-11 - signed chap.414
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies eligibility requirements for admission to the New York state veterans' home.
Title
Clarifies eligibility requirements for admission to the New York state veterans' home.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-11 | Senate | signed chap.414 |
2015-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S305A |
2015-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.144 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.144 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | print number 7229a |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S00305 (Same As) 2015-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7229A