NY A07157 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-01 - print number 7157a
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-01 - print number 7157a
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the construction, development or siting of hazardous wildlife attractants near airports.
Title
Prohibits the construction, development or siting of hazardous wildlife attractants near airports.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Assembly | print number 7157a |
2012-03-01 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to local governments |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2011-04-14 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S06243 (Same As) 2012-04-04 - PRINT NUMBER 6243A