NY A07123 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to instituting additional ballot accountability practices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to instituting additional ballot accountability practices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 112 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-22SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-22Senate3RD READING CAL.736
2019-05-22SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5129
2019-05-08SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2019-05-08Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-08Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-02Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.270
2019-05-01Assemblyreported
2019-04-09Assemblyreferred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S05129 (Same As) 2019-05-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7123

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback