NY S05129 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - signed chap.63
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - signed chap.63
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to instituting additional ballot accountability practices.
Title
Relates to instituting additional ballot accountability practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Senate | signed chap.63 |
2019-06-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.736 |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5129 |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-08 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-08 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-02 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.270 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | reported |
2019-04-09 | Senate | referred to election law |
2019-05-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7123 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.736 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-04-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07123 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - signed chap.63