NY A07034 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires employees of gaming facilities to undergo human-trafficking recognition training which shall address the nature of human trafficking, how human trafficking is defined in law, how to identify victims of human trafficking, relief and recovery options for survivors, and social and legal services available to victims.
Title
Requires employees of gaming facilities to undergo human-trafficking recognition training which shall address the nature of human trafficking, how human trafficking is defined in law, how to identify victims of human trafficking, relief and recovery options for survivors, and social and legal services available to victims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 7034a |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.496 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.240 |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S06893 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES