NY S06893 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires employees of gaming facilities to undergo human-trafficking recognition training which shall address the nature of human trafficking, how human trafficking is defined in law, how to identify victims of human trafficking, relief and recovery options for survivors, and social and legal services available to victims.
Title
Requires employees of gaming facilities to undergo human-trafficking recognition training which shall address the nature of human trafficking, how human trafficking is defined in law, how to identify victims of human trafficking, relief and recovery options for survivors, and social and legal services available to victims.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1083 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6893A |
2018-05-02 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2017-09-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07034 (Same As) 2018-04-23 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION