NY A07019 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-28 - print number 7019b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-28 - print number 7019b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the number of county court judges in Saratoga county by one justice.
Title
Increases the number of county court judges in Saratoga county by one justice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-28 | Assembly | print number 7019b |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | print number 7019a |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S07020 (Same As) 2024-05-28 - PRINT NUMBER 7020B