NY A07007 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - signed chap.574
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - signed chap.574
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the number of years a small business can participate in the small business mentor program from four years to five years for Tier 1 and from four years to five years for Tier 2; increases cap on awards under MTA's small business mentor program from one million dollars to one million five hundred thousand dollars for Tier 2 contracts; requires a report to the legislature and the governor.
Title
Increases the number of years a small business can participate in the small business mentor program from four years to five years for Tier 1 and from four years to five years for Tier 2; increases cap on awards under MTA's small business mentor program from one million dollars to one million five hundred thousand dollars for Tier 2 contracts; requires a report to the legislature and the governor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-25 | Assembly | signed chap.574 |
2023-10-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-06-07 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-07 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1693 |
2023-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6659A |
2023-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.602 |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | rules report cal.602 |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 7007a |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S06659 (Same As) 2023-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7007A