NY A06974 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-15 - substituted by s4482
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-15 - substituted by s4482
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions of law relating to the mortgage recording tax in the county of Yates.
Title
Extends provisions of law relating to the mortgage recording tax in the county of Yates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-15 | Assembly | substituted by s4482 |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.277 |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-04-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04482 (Same As) 2011-08-15 - SIGNED CHAP.395